WV SB620 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide pregnancy help centers greater flexibility to receive funding for items such as capital expenditures and training. Currently, the funding is limited to a fee per service arrangement.
Title
Establishing WV Mothers and Babies Pregnancy Support Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-14 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 138) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | House | To House Finance |
2024-02-15 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 138) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-14 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-13 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-02-12 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2024-02-02 | Senate | To Finance |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-02 | Senate | To Finance |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 66 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |