WV SB460 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Chapter 147, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Chapter 147, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Permitting School of Osteopathic Medicine invest certain moneys in its foundation
Title
Permitting School of Osteopathic Medicine invest certain moneys in its foundation
Sponsors
Sen. Ronald Miller [D] | Sen. William Laird [D] | Sen. John Unger [D] | Sen. Robert Beach [D] |
Sen. Herb Snyder [D] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] | Sen. Evan Jenkins [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 2) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 238) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 8) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 238) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 8) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 147, Acts, Regular Session, 2014 |
2014-03-08 | House | Approved by Governor 3/7/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/7/14 |
2014-03-08 | House | To Governor 3/7/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-07 | Senate | To Governor 3/7/14 |
2014-03-04 | House | House received Senate message |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 2) |
2014-03-04 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-03-03 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-03-03 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 238) |
2014-03-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-03 | House | On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-28 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2014-02-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-02-28 | House | On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-27 | House | Read 1st time |
2014-02-27 | House | Immediate consideration |
2014-02-27 | House | Reference dispensed |
2014-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 8) |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-02-26 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-02-25 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Having been read 1st time 2/20/14 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | On 2nd reading to Finance |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Finance |
2014-01-31 | Senate | To Education |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-01-31 | Senate | To Education then Finance |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4435 (Same As) 2014-02-26 - Tabled on 3rd reading, Daily Calendar
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
12 | 1 | 12d | Amended Code | Citation Text |