WV SB380 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Chapter 125, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Chapter 125, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to amend the definition of all-terrain vehicle and utility terrain vehicle.
Title
Redefining "all-terrain and utility terrain vehicles"
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 55) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 398) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 6) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 398) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 6) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 125, Acts, Regular Session, 2014 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/24/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/24/14 |
2014-03-14 | House | Approved by Governor 3/24/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-14 | House | To Governor 3/21/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-14 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-21 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/14 |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 55) |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Senate concurred in House title amendment (Voice vote) |
2014-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-03-08 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2014-03-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 398) |
2014-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2014-03-06 | House | On 1st reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-05 | House | Do pass |
2014-02-05 | House | To House Judiciary |
2014-02-05 | House | To Judiciary |
2014-02-05 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 6) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-02-04 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-02-03 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2014-01-31 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2014-01-29 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2014-01-20 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-01-20 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure then Judiciary |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17A | 1 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17A | 6 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |