WV SB373 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-04 - To House Health and Human Resources
Pending: House Health & Human Resources Committee
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-04 - To House Health and Human Resources
Pending: House Health & Human Resources Committee
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to establish the Caregivers Consent Act, allowing a caregiver who is not a parent, legal custodian or guardian of a minor to consent to health care for a minor through an affidavit. The bill provides for the revocation and termination of consent, good faith reliance on the affidavit, exceptions to an affidavit's applicability, penalties for a false statement in an affidavit of consent and rule-making authority. This article is new; therefore, strike-throughs and underscoring have been omitted
Title
Creating Caregivers Consent Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-04 | To House Health and Human Resources | |
2010-03-04 | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary | |
2010-03-04 | Introduced in House | |
2010-03-03 | Ordered to House | |
2010-03-03 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 52) | |
2010-03-03 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-03-03 | Deferred until Foot of 3rd | |
2010-03-03 | On 3rd reading | |
2010-03-02 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-03-02 | On 2nd reading | |
2010-03-01 | Read 1st time | |
2010-03-01 | On 1st reading | |
2010-02-26 | Committee substitute reported | |
2010-02-03 | To Judiciary | |
2010-02-03 | Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary | |
2010-01-28 | To Health and Human Resources | |
2010-01-28 | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary | |
2010-01-28 | Introduced in Senate | |
2010-01-28 | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary | |
2010-01-28 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4374 (Same As) 2010-06-06 - Effective Date
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
49 | 11 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 11 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 11 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 11 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 11 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 11 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 11 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 11 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 11 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 11 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=373&year=2010&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |