WV SB349 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 234, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 234, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Updating meaning of federal adjusted gross income
Title
Updating meaning of federal adjusted gross income
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-09 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 351) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 351) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 414) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 413) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 75) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 75) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 351) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 414) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 413) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 75) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 75) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | Senate | Chapter 234, Acts, Regular Session, 2016 |
2016-03-15 | House | Approved by Governor 3/15/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/15/16 |
2016-03-14 | Senate | To Governor 3/14/16 |
2016-03-14 | House | To Governor 3/14/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 351) |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 351) |
2016-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-08 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 414) |
2016-03-08 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 413) |
2016-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-03-05 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-04 | House | With title amendment, do pass |
2016-02-10 | House | To House Finance |
2016-02-10 | House | To Finance |
2016-02-10 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 75) |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 75) |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-09 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-08 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-02-06 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-02-06 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2016-01-21 | Senate | To Finance |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-01-21 | Senate | To Finance |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4030 (Similar To) 2016-01-15 - To House Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 21 | 71a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 21 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |