WV SB30 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-25 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-25 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting autocycles from license examination and safety equipment requirements
Title
Exempting autocycles from license examination and safety equipment requirements
Sponsors
Sen. Herb Snyder [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 1) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-25 | House | To House Judiciary |
2014-02-25 | House | To Judiciary |
2014-02-25 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 1) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-02-24 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-02-21 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2014-02-20 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Committee substitute for committee substitute reported |
2014-02-12 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary |
2014-01-08 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-01-08 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure then Judiciary |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17B | 1 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17B | 2 | 7b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17C | 1 | 69 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17C | 15 | 44 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18C | 3 | 1a | New Code | See Bill Text |