WV SB274 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Chapter 155, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Chapter 155, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to number of child protective service workers in counties
Title
Requiring secretary of DHHR to allocate CPS workers by Bureau of Social Services' district annually
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 403) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 403) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 413) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 412) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 162) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 162) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 403) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 413) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 412) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 162) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 162) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Senate | Chapter 155, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/28/22 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/28/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | Approved by Governor 3/28/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | To Governor 3/15/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-15 | Senate | To Governor 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-12 | House | To Governor 3/15/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 403) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 403) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-08 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 413) |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 412) |
2022-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-07 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-03-05 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-04 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2022-02-22 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2022-02-22 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2022-02-22 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 162) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 162) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-21 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-18 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-02-17 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2022-01-14 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-01-14 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
9 | 2 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |