WV HB5399 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to modify state auditing practices and requirements to facilitate efficient financial management of volunteer and part-volunteer fire departments; directing state audit functions of these departments to the State Auditor; freezing state funding to any fire departments that fail to cooperate with a state audit; requiring that both the fire chief and treasurer sign any sworn statements required to be submitted to the state auditor; requiring that volunteer and part-volunteer fire departments be audited at least once every 5 years; providing for restitution be paid to volunteer and part-time fire departments double the amount of property unlawfully stolen or embezzled; requiring posting a notice of this penalty in volunteer and part-volunteer fire departments; and establishing a pilot project to evaluate how volunteer and part-volunteer fire departments implement the State Auditor's Checkbook accounting system.
Title
To modify the state auditing practices of the volunteer and part-volunteer fire departments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 330) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2024-02-29 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-27 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-02-27 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 330) |
2024-02-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-27 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-26 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-23 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-02-23 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-22 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2024-02-08 | House | To House Finance |
2024-02-08 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2024-01-31 | House | To House Government Organization |
2024-01-31 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-01-31 | House | To Government Organization then Finance |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
12 | 4 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
12 | 4 | 14a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
12 | 4 | 14b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 3 | 33 | Amended Code | Citation Text |