WV HB5273 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Chapter 224, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Chapter 224, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to clarify EMSRS surviving spouse benefits when member dies from duty or non-duty related cause, and to clarify how to compute a retiree's age when the member elected an early retirement and then returned to work.
Title
Relating to the Emergency Medical Services Retirement System and clarifying payment upon death of member with less than 10 years of contributory service
Sponsors
Del. Marty Gearheart [R] | Del. Chris Pritt [R] | Del. William Anderson [R] | Del. Rickey Griffith [D] |
Del. Larry Kump [R] | Del. Keith Marple [R] | Del. John Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 172) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 168) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 168) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | House | Chapter 224, Acts, Regular Session, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/6/2024 - House Journal |
2024-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/6/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/6/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-01 | House | To Governor 2/29/2024 - House Journal |
2024-03-01 | House | To Governor 2/29/2024 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | To Governor 2/29/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-02-20 | House | House received Senate message |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 172) |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-19 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-16 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-02-15 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-13 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-02-13 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 168) |
2024-02-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-13 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-12 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-09 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-02-09 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-08 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2024-01-31 | House | To House Finance |
2024-01-31 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2024-01-29 | House | To House Pensions and Retirement |
2024-01-29 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-01-29 | House | To Pensions and Retirement then Finance |
2024-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB608 (Similar To) 2024-02-14 - Referred to Rules on 2nd reading
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 5V | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 5V | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 5V | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 5V | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |