WV HB5235 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-24 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-24 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to increase penalties related to child sexual assault and sexual abuse; to increase penalties for distributing, possessing and transporting material depicting a child engaged in sexually explicit conduct; and to clarify that that failure to report sexual assault, sexual abuse, or sexual exploitation of a child is a felony.
Title
To double the criminal penalty for anyone found guilty of sexual assault on a minor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-23 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 274) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-24 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2024-02-24 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2024-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-23 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-02-23 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 274) |
2024-02-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-23 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-22 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-21 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-02-21 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-20 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2024-01-26 | House | To House Judiciary |
2024-01-26 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-01-26 | House | To Judiciary |
2024-01-26 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | 8B | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
61 | 8B | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
61 | 8D | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
61 | 8D | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |