WV HB5188 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Chapter 74, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Chapter 74, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to eliminate the prerequisite that a disabled police officer or firefighter be found unable to engage in other substantial gainful employment before awarding disability benefits.
Title
Relating to awards and benefits for duty related disability in the municipal police officers and firefighters retirement system
Sponsors
Del. Geno Chiarelli [R] | Del. Phil Mallow [R] | Del. Mike Devault [R] | Del. Charles Sheedy [R] |
Del. Michael Hornby [R] | Del. Elliott Pritt [D] | Del. Sean Hornbuckle [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-08 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 691) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 414) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 367) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 414) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 367) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | House | Chapter 74, Acts, Regular Session, 2024 |
2024-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/22/2024 - House Journal |
2024-03-22 | House | Approved by Governor 3/22/2024 |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/22/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/21/2024 - House Journal |
2024-03-21 | House | To Governor 3/21/2024 |
2024-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2024-03-08 | House | Completed legislative action |
2024-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-03-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 691) |
2024-03-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 414) |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-07 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-06 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendments |
2024-02-29 | Senate | To Finance |
2024-02-29 | Senate | To Finance |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-28 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-02-28 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 367) |
2024-02-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-28 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-27 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-26 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-02-26 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-23 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2024-02-07 | House | To House Finance |
2024-02-07 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2024-01-25 | House | To House Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security |
2024-01-25 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-01-25 | House | To Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security then Finance |
2024-01-25 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
8 | 22A | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |