WV HB5043 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - To Economic Development
Pending: Senate Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - To Economic Development
Pending: Senate Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to revise and/or establish requirements, prohibitions and regulation of foreign principals or agents of foreign principals, lobbying by or on behalf of such foreign principals or their agents, and to establish criminal liabilities and fines for violations of the requirements applicable to such foreign principals or their agents.
Title
Relating to requirements, prohibitions and regulation of foreign principals or agents of foreign principals, lobbying by or on behalf of such foreign principals or their agents
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-23 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 273) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | Senate | To Economic Development |
2024-02-29 | Senate | To Economic Development then Judiciary |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-23 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-02-23 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 273) |
2024-02-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-23 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-22 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-21 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-02-21 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-20 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2024-01-23 | House | To House Judiciary |
2024-01-23 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-01-23 | House | To Judiciary |
2024-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
6B | 3 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
6B | 3 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
6B | 3 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
6B | 3 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
6B | 3 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
6B | 3A | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
6B | 3A | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
6B | 3A | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
6B | 3A | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
6B | 3A | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
6B | 3A | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
6B | 3A | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
6B | 3A | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
6B | 3A | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
6B | 3A | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
6B | 3A | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |