WV HB5039 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to grant the Commissioner of the Division of Motor Vehicles jurisdiction over license revocation proceedings for the civil offense of refusing a secondary chemical test.
Title
Relating to authorizing the West Virginia Division of Motor Vehicles to enforce administrative penalties for the civil offense of refusing a secondary chemical test
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 296) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No. 287) (Y: 75 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 286) (Y: 38 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2024-02-19 - House - Motion to recommit to Judiciary tabled (Roll No. 210) (Y: 50 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No. 287) (Y: 75 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 286) (Y: 38 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2024-02-19 - House - Motion to recommit to Judiciary tabled (Roll No. 210) (Y: 50 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2024-02-29 | Senate | To Government Organization then Judiciary |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-26 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-02-26 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-02-26 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 296) |
2024-02-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-26 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-23 | House | Amendment adopted (Roll No. 287) |
2024-02-23 | House | Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 286) |
2024-02-23 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2024-02-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-23 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-22 | House | Postponed on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 2/23/2024 |
2024-02-22 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-21 | House | Postponed on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 2/22/2024 |
2024-02-21 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-20 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-02-19 | House | Tabled on 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-19 | House | Motion to recommit to Judiciary tabled (Roll No. 210) |
2024-02-20 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-19 | House | Do pass |
2024-01-31 | House | To House Judiciary |
2024-01-31 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2024-01-23 | House | To House Technology and Infrastructure |
2024-01-23 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-01-23 | House | To Technology and Infrastructure then Judiciary |
2024-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17C | 5 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17C | 5 | 7a | Amended Code | Citation Text |