WV HB4667 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Chapter 220, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Chapter 220, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to prohibit harm reduction programs in West Virginia to distribute any smoking devices as part of the program.
Title
Prohibiting syringe services programs from distributing listed smoking devices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 334) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 310) (Y: 88 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 310) (Y: 88 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | House | Chapter 220, Acts, Regular Session, 2024 |
2024-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/22/2024 - House Journal |
2024-03-22 | House | Approved by Governor 3/22/2024 |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/22/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/13/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/13/2024 - House Journal |
2024-03-13 | House | To Governor 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-05 | House | House received Senate message |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 334) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-04 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-01 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2024-02-28 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2024-02-28 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-27 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-02-27 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 310) |
2024-02-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-27 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-26 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-23 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-02-23 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-22 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2024-02-22 | House | To House Judiciary |
2024-02-08 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2024-01-12 | House | To House Prevention and Treatment of Substance Abuse |
2024-01-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-01-12 | House | To Prevention and Treatment of Substance Abuse then Judiciary |
2024-01-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 64 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |