WV HB4411 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-08 - Communicated to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-08 - Communicated to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to allow the disposal of drill cuttings and associated drilling waste generated from well sites in commercial solid waste facilities. The bill permits that disposal even if it results in the facility going over its maximum monthly permitted limits if the drilling waste is placed in a separate cell dedicated solely for those wastes. The bill provides that the facility may not refuse municipal waste until its monthly limit is reached.
Title
Allowing the disposal of drill cuttings and associated drilling waste generated from well sites in commercial solid waste facilities
Sponsors
Sen. Rupert Phillips [R] | Sen. Bob Ashley [R] | Del. Larry Barker [D] | Del. Kevin Craig [D] |
Del. Jeff Eldridge [D] | Del. Allen Evans [R] | Del. Michael Ferro [D] | Sen. Bill Hamilton [R] |
Del. Doug Skaff [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-08 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 482) (Y: 70 N: 14 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 30) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 29) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 210) (Y: 81 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 30) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 29) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 210) (Y: 81 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-03-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 482) |
2014-03-08 | House | House conference committee discharged |
2014-03-08 | House | Conference time expired |
2014-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-03-08 | House | To conference |
2014-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-03-08 | House | House appointed conferees: Fleischauer, Ferro, Ireland |
2014-03-08 | House | House agreed to conference |
2014-03-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Senate appoints conference committee: Snyder, Kirkendoll, Blair |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Senate refused to recede; requested conference (Voice vote) |
2014-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-03-08 | House | House refused to concur; requested Senate to recede (Voice) |
2014-03-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 30) |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-07 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Committee amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote) |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Amendment to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment Reported |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-06 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2014-03-05 | Senate | 2nd reference dispensed |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Reported do pass with amend and title amend but first to Judiciary |
2014-02-27 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2014-02-27 | Senate | To Government Organization then Judiciary |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-02-27 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-02-26 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-02-26 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 210) |
2014-02-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-02-26 | House | On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-25 | House | Amendment rejected (Voice vote) |
2014-02-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-24 | House | Read 1st time |
2014-02-24 | House | On 1st reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-21 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2014-02-14 | House | To House Judiciary |
2014-02-14 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2014-02-05 | House | To House Energy |
2014-02-05 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-02-05 | House | To Energy then Judiciary |
2014-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB474 (Same As) 2014-02-18 - Senator Kirkendoll requests to be removed as sponsor of bill
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 15 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22 | 15 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |