WV HB4393 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Chapter 40, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Chapter 40, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to create the Dangerous Wild Animals Act. The bill sets forth findings and purpose. The bill defines terms. The bill creates the Dangerous Wild Animal Board. The bill sets forth the duties of the board. The bill requires the board to create a list of dangerous wild animals by rule. The bill permits the board to issue a permit for a dangerous wild animal legally possessed prior to the effective date of the rules. The bill prohibits the possession of a dangerous wild animal thereafter. The bill sets forth permit requirements. The bill provides for confiscation and disposition of animals. The bill permits the suspension and revocation of permits. The bill provides exemptions. The bill provides rule-making authority. The bill establishes criminal and civil penalties. This article is new; therefore, it has been completely underscored.
Title
Creating the Dangerous Wild Animals Act
Sponsors
Del. Randal Swartzmiller [D] | Del. Danny Wells [D] | Del. Michael Manypenny [D] | Del. John Ellem [R] |
Del. Brady Paxton [D] | Del. Ronald Fragale [D] | Del. Kevin Craig [D] | Del. Erikka Storch [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-06 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 303) (Y: 69 N: 23 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 13) (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 153) (Y: 72 N: 23 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 13) (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 153) (Y: 72 N: 23 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | House | Chapter 40, Acts, Regular Session, 2014 |
2014-03-21 | House | Approved by Governor 3/21/14 |
2014-03-14 | House | Approved by Governor 3/21/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/21/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-14 | House | To Governor 3/17/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-17 | House | To Governor 3/17/14 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | To Governor 3/17/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-03-06 | House | Completed legislative action |
2014-03-06 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-03-06 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 303) |
2014-03-06 | House | House received Senate message |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 13) |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-06 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-05 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2014-03-04 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2014-03-03 | Senate | 2nd reference dispensed |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendments, but first to Judiciary |
2014-02-25 | Senate | To Agriculture and Rural Development |
2014-02-25 | Senate | To Agriculture and Rural Development then Judiciary |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-02-25 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-02-24 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-02-24 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 153) |
2014-02-24 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2014-02-24 | House | Placed at foot of bills on 3rd reading |
2014-02-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-02-24 | House | On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-21 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2014-02-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-02-21 | House | On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-20 | House | Read 1st time |
2014-02-20 | House | On 1st reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-19 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2014-02-14 | House | To House Judiciary |
2014-02-14 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2014-02-03 | House | To House Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2014-02-03 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-02-03 | House | To Agriculture and Natural Resources then Judiciary |
2014-02-03 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB428 (Similar To) 2014-01-24 - To Natural Resources
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 34 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 34 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 34 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 34 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 34 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 34 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 34 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 34 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 34 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 34 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |