WV HB4376 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Chapter 218, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Chapter 218, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to ensure that a smoke evacuation system is in place to protect medical personnel during any medical treatment where there could be surgical smoke.
Title
Relating to surgical smoke evacuation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - House - House concurred in Senate amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 438) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 327) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 67) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 327) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 67) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | House | Chapter 218, Acts, Regular Session, 2024 |
2024-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/22/2024 - House Journal |
2024-03-22 | House | Approved by Governor 3/22/2024 |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/22/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/13/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/13/2024 - House Journal |
2024-03-13 | House | To Governor 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | House Message received |
2024-03-04 | House | Completed legislative action |
2024-03-04 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-03-04 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 438) |
2024-03-04 | House | Immediate consideration |
2024-03-04 | House | House received Senate message |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 327) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-01 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 2/28/2024 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2024-02-01 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2024-02-01 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-01-31 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-01-31 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 67) |
2024-01-31 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-01-31 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-01-30 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-01-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-01-30 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-01-29 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-01-29 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-01-26 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2024-01-10 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2024-01-10 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-01-10 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2024-01-10 | House | Filed for introduction |