WV HB4363 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 257, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 257, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the West Virginia Division of Natural Resources Police Officer Retirement System
Title
Establishing the West Virginia Division of Natural Resources Police Officer Retirement System
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - House - Effective July 1, 2020 (Roll No. 712) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 711) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2020 (Roll No. 495) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 495) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - Effective July 1, 2020 (Roll No. 278) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 277) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 711) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2020 (Roll No. 495) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 495) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - Effective July 1, 2020 (Roll No. 278) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 277) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-15 | House | Chapter 257, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | To Governor 3/19/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-19 | House | To Governor 3/19/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/19/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-03-07 | House | Completed legislative action |
2020-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-03-07 | House | Effective July 1, 2020 (Roll No. 712) |
2020-03-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 711) |
2020-03-07 | House | House received Senate message |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2020 (Roll No. 495) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 495) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 3/5/20 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2020-03-02 | Senate | On 2nd reading to Finance |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendments, but first to Finance |
2020-02-24 | Senate | To Pensions |
2020-02-24 | Senate | To Pensions then Finance |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-21 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-21 | House | Effective July 1, 2020 (Roll No. 278) |
2020-02-21 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 277) |
2020-02-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-21 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-20 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-19 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-19 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-18 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2020-02-12 | House | To House Finance |
2020-02-12 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2020-01-15 | House | To House Pensions and Retirement |
2020-01-15 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-15 | House | To Pensions and Retirement then Finance |
2020-01-15 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB233 (Similar To) 2020-01-09 - To Pensions
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 5V | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 18 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 18 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 18 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 18 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 18 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 18 | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 18 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 18 | 16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 18 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 18 | 18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 18 | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 18 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 18 | 20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 18 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 18 | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 18 | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 18 | 24 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 18 | 25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 18 | 26 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 18 | 27 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 18 | 28 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 18 | 29 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 18 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 18 | 30 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 18 | 31 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 18 | 32 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 18 | 33 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 18 | 34 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 18 | 35 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 18 | 36 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 18 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 18 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 18 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 18 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 18 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 18 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 10 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 10D | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 14D | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 22A | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |