WV HB2924 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2924
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 163, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 163, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to permit the West Virginia Tourism Office to contract with the Division of Highways to sell advertising space on the WV511 website to promote in state tourism and raise capital for technological improvements to the website; permitting 50 percent of the funds from such sale to be deposited in the Tourism Promotion Fund; and requiring 50 percent of the funds from such sale be remitted to the Division of Highways.
Title
Permitting the West Virginia Tourism Office to decide to contract with the Division of Highways to sell advertising space on the WV511 website
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 133) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-17 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 13) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-17 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 13) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-15 | House | Chapter 163, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Approved by Governor 2/24/20 - House Journal |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Approved by Governor 2/24/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-02-24 | House | Approved by Governor 2/24/20 |
2020-02-18 | House | To Governor 2/18/20 |
2020-02-19 | House | To Governor 2/18/20 - House Journal |
2020-02-18 | Senate | To Governor 2/18/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-02-13 | House | House received Senate message |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 133) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-12 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-11 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-10 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2020-01-20 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2020-01-20 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-01-17 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-01-17 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 13) |
2020-01-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-01-17 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-16 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-01-16 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-15 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-01-15 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-14 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2020-01-08 | House | To House Government Organization |
2020-01-08 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-08 | House | To Government Organization |
2020-01-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2924 (Carry Over) 2019-02-22 - To Government Organization
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5B | 2I | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |