WI SJR78 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 21 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-21 - Report correctly enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 21 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-21 - Report correctly enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: commending and congratulating Chancellor Richard H. Wells for his contributions to the University of Wisconsin-Oshkosh and the state of Wisconsin.
Title
Commending and congratulating Chancellor Richard H. Wells for his contributions to the University of Wisconsin-Oshkosh and the state of Wisconsin.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-21 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2014-03-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-18 | House | Representative Wright added as a cosponsor |
2014-03-18 | House | Concurred in |
2014-03-18 | House | Rules suspended and taken up |
2014-03-18 | House | Read |
2014-03-18 | House | Received from Senate |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Adopted |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-18-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Introduced |