WI SJR62 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-3)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-3)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: honoring the life and legacy of Ada Deer.
Title
Honoring the life and legacy of Ada Deer.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-11-08 | House | Read and referred to committee on Rules |
2023-10-18 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-10-17 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-10-17 | Senate | Adopted |
2023-10-16 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-17-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2023-09-12 | Senate | Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor |
2023-09-08 | Senate | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor |
2023-09-08 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2023-09-08 | Senate | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization |
2023-09-08 | Senate | Introduced |