WI SJR111 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To create section 27 of article I of the constitution; Relating to: prohibiting governmental entity discrimination (first consideration).
Title
Prohibiting governmental entity discrimination (first consideration).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Report adoption recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Introduced |