WI SB962 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 253.13 (6) of the statutes; Relating to: the procedure for adding federal newborn screening recommendations to the state-required newborn screenings, granting rule-making authority, and providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures. (FE)
Title
The procedure for adding federal newborn screening recommendations to the state-required newborn screenings, granting rule-making authority, and providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-03-14 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2024-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 5, Noes 1 |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Introduced |