WI SB944 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 758.20 (4) of the statutes; Relating to: the availability of information on crimes through the consolidated court automation programs.
Title
The availability of information on crimes through the consolidated court automation programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Van Wanggaard [R] | Sen. Dan Knodl [R] | Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] | Sen. Cory Tomczyk [R] |
Rep. Ron Tusler [R] | Rep. Scott Allen [R] | Rep. Jerry O'Connor [R] | Rep. Dave Maxey [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-03-14 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2024-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 22, Noes 10 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 2 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 2 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Wanggaard |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced |