WI SB932 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-29 - Report vetoed by the Governor on 3-29-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on March 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-29 - Report vetoed by the Governor on 3-29-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 775.01; to amend 13.48 (4), 16.867 (2) and 20.924 (1) (d); and to create 13.48 (19) (am), 16.007 (2m), 16.40 (20b), 16.855 (3m), 16.858 (3m), 16.867 (3), 16.899 and 775.01 (2) of the statutes; Relating to: modifications to building program project budgets, selection of project architects and engineers, single prime contracting, agency cooperation with energy conservation contractors, timeline for claims before the Claims Board, and making a transfer to the state building trust fund. (FE)
Title
Modifications to building program project budgets, selection of project architects and engineers, single prime contracting, agency cooperation with energy conservation contractors, timeline for claims before the Claims Board, and making a transfer to the state building trust fund. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-29 | Senate | Report vetoed by the Governor on 3-29-2024 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-26-2024 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2024-02-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-02-22 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2024-02-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-02-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-22 | House | Read a second time |
2024-02-20 | House | Made a special order of business at 11:34 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2024-02-20 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2024-02-13 | House | Received from Senate |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Read a second time |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 12, Noes 3 |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 12, Noes 3 |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and rereferred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Ballweg |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced |