WI SB821 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on May 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-12 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on May 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-12 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 70.111 (27) (b); to renumber and amend 79.096 (1) and 79.096 (2) (a); to amend 16.518 (title), 16.518 (3) (b) 1., 71.05 (22) (dp) (title), 71.05 (22) (dp) 1., 71.05 (22) (dp) 2., 71.05 (22) (dt), 71.05 (22) (f) 4. b. and 79.096 (3); and to create 16.518 (4), 70.111 (27) (b) 2., 71.05 (22) (dq), 79.096 (1) (b), 79.096 (2) (a) 1. and 79.096 (2) (a) 2. of the statutes; Relating to: a property tax exemption for all machinery, tools, and patterns; a reduction of state general obligation and variable rate debt supported by general purpose revenue; and increasing the maximum deduction under the individual income tax sliding scale standard deduction. (FE)
Title
A property tax exemption for all machinery, tools, and patterns; a reduction of state general obligation and variable rate debt supported by general purpose revenue; and increasing the maximum deduction under the individual income tax sliding scale standard deduction. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Fitzgerald [R] | Sen. Roger Roth [R] | Sen. Alberta Darling [R] | Rep. Robin Vos [R] |
Rep. Jim Steineke [R] | Rep. John Nygren [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 65 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - Assembly: Decision of the Chair upheld (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Refused to reconsider vote by which Senate Bill 821 passed offered by Senator Fitzgerald (Y: 14 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Move to call the question (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Senate Substitute Amendment 1 rejected (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - Assembly: Decision of the Chair upheld (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Refused to reconsider vote by which Senate Bill 821 passed offered by Senator Fitzgerald (Y: 14 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Move to call the question (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Senate Substitute Amendment 1 rejected (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | Senate | Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82 |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Placed on calendar 5-12-2020 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Report vetoed by the Governor on 2-26-2020 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 2-24-2020 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 65, Noes 34 |
2020-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-20 | House | Decision of the Chair upheld, Ayes 63, Noes 36 |
2020-02-20 | House | Decision of the Chair appealed |
2020-02-20 | House | Point of order that Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 not germane under Assembly Rule 54 (3)(f) well taken |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Hintz, Hesselbein, Spreitzer, Doyle, Anderson, Billings, Bowen, Brostoff, Cabrera, Considine, Crowley, Emerson, Fields, Goyke, Haywood, Hebl, Kolste, McGuire, B. Meyers, Milroy, L. Myers, Neubauer, Ohnstad, Pope, Riemer, Sargent, Shankland, Sinicki, Stubbs, Stuck, Subeck, C. Taylor, Vining, Vruwink and Zamarripa |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2020-02-20 | House | Made a special order of business at 11:51 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21 |
2020-02-20 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Messaged |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Refused to reconsider vote by which Senate Bill 821 passed offered by Senator Fitzgerald, Ayes 14, Noes 19 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Move to call the question, Ayes 19, Noes 14 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 19, Noes 14 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Move to call the question |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 rejected, Ayes 19, Noes 14 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read a second time |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senators Shilling, Schachtner, Bewley, Carpenter, Erpenbach, Hansen, Johnson, Larson, Miller, Ringhand, Risser, Smith, L. Taylor and Wirch |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-19-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Representative Knodl added as a cosponsor |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 10, Noes 4 |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Joint Committee on Finance |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Introduced |