WI SB73 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-9)
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-13 - Published 3-14-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-9)
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-13 - Published 3-14-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 71.05 (6) (a) 15., 71.05 (6) (b) 47. b., 71.21 (4) (a), 71.26 (2) (a) 4., 71.34 (1k) (g), 71.45 (2) (a) 10. and 77.92 (4); and to create 71.07 (8s), 71.10 (4) (cf), 71.28 (8s), 71.30 (3) (cf), 71.47 (8s), 71.49 (1) (cf) and 73.155 of the statutes; Relating to: an income and franchise tax credit for workplace wellness programs, granting rule-making authority, and requiring the exercise of rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
An income and franchise tax credit for workplace wellness programs, granting rule-making authority, and requiring the exercise of rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-18 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in as amended (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-05 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-05 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | Published 3-14-2014 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-13-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 137 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-12-2014 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Action ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Assembly Amendment 1 concurred in |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-11-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly amended and concurred in as amended, Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2014-02-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-18 | House | Read a third time and concurred in as amended, Ayes 97, Noes 0 |
2014-02-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-02-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2014-02-18 | House | Read a second time |
2014-02-18 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2014-02-18 | House | Representative Barca added as a cosponsor |
2014-02-13 | House | Placed on calendar 2-18-2014 by Committee on Rules |
2014-02-10 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Murtha |
2013-11-25 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2013-11-05 | House | Received from Senate |
2013-11-05 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-11-05 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 33, Noes 0 |
2013-11-05 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-11-05 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-11-05 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2013-11-05 | Senate | Read a second time |
2013-11-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-5-2013 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2013-11-01 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor |
2013-10-16 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2013-10-16 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2013-10-16 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2013-10-10 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2013-09-16 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2013-09-16 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Small Business, and Tourism, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2013-09-16 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Small Business, and Tourism, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2013-09-12 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2013-08-22 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Moulton |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Small Business, and Tourism |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Introduced |