WI SB608 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 227.137 (5), 227.137 (6) (a), 227.137 (6) (b), 227.137 (6) (c) and 227.137 (6) (d); to renumber and amend 227.137 (6) (intro.) and 227.137 (7); to amend 227.135 (2), 227.135 (3), 227.137 (2), 227.137 (3) (intro.), 227.137 (4), 227.14 (2) (a) 6., 227.15 (1), 227.17 (3) (em), 227.185, 227.19 (3) (intro.), 227.24 (1) (e) 1d. and 227.24 (1) (e) 1g.; and to create 227.135 (2m), 227.135 (5), 227.137 (2m), 227.137 (3m), 227.137 (4m) and 227.137 (6) (cm) of the statutes; Relating to: elimination of the requirement that the governor approve a proposed rule that was considered at the joint annual spring fish and wildlife rule hearing of the Department of Natural Resources and county meeting of the Wisconsin Conservation Congress and limitation of the scope of the requirement that an economic impact analysis be prepared for such a proposed rule. (FE)
Title
Elimination of the requirement that the governor approve a proposed rule that was considered at the joint annual spring fish and wildlife rule hearing of the Department of Natural Resources and county meeting of the Wisconsin Conservation Congress and limitation of the scope of the requirement that an economic impact analysis be prepared for such a proposed rule. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Kathleen Vinehout [D] | Sen. Mark Miller [D] | Sen. Julie Lassa [D] | Sen. John Lehman [D] |
Rep. Fred Clark [D] | Rep. Terese Berceau [D] | Rep. Tod Ohnstad [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Natural Resources |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb608 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/SB608.pdf |