WI SB435 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 62-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 62-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 71.05 (1) (am), 71.05 (1) (an), 71.05 (6) (b) 4. (intro.), 71.05 (6) (b) 54. (intro.), 71.06 (1q) (c), 71.06 (2) (i) 3., 71.06 (2) (j) 3. and 71.83 (1) (a) 6.; and to create 71.05 (6) (b) 54m. and 71.05 (6) (b) 54mn. of the statutes; Relating to: lowering the individual income tax rates in the third bracket and increasing and expanding the retirement income subtraction. (FE)
Title
Lowering the individual income tax rates in the third bracket and increasing and expanding the retirement income subtraction. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-10-11 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2023-10-11 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Universities and Revenue, Ayes 5, Noes 3 |
2023-10-10 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2023-10-03 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-09-26 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-09-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Revenue |
2023-09-20 | Senate | Introduced |