WI SB425 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 48.65 (1); and to create 48.651 (4) of the statutes; Relating to: allowing certified child care operators to provide care to up to six children. (FE)
Title
Allowing certified child care operators to provide care to up to six children. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-10-18 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-09-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families |
2023-09-08 | Senate | Introduced |