WI SB35 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-14)
Status: Passed on August 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - Published 8-3-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-14)
Status: Passed on August 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - Published 8-3-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 48.66 (1) (b); and to create 48.02 (10m), 48.02 (16m), 48.981 (1) (cu) and 48.981 (2) (a) 30. of the statutes; Relating to: mandatory reporting of child abuse and neglect by juvenile correctional officers.
Title
Mandatory reporting of child abuse and neglect by juvenile correctional officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-02 | Senate | Published 8-3-2017 |
2017-08-02 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 8-2-2017. 2017 Wisconsin Act 47 |
2017-08-01 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 8-1-2017 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2017-05-10 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-05-10 | House | Representative Barca added as a cosponsor |
2017-05-10 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2017-05-10 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-05-10 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-05-10 | House | Read a second time |
2017-05-10 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2017-05-04 | House | Placed on calendar 5-10-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-04-20 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-04-20 | House | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Children and Families, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2017-04-12 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-03-29 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-03-29 | House | Representative Kitchens added as a cosponsor |
2017-03-09 | House | Representative Loudenbeck added as a cosponsor |
2017-03-08 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Children and Families |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senator Miller added as a coauthor |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Read a second time |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senator Bewley added as a coauthor |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senator Hansen added as a coauthor |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-7-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced |