WI SB307 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on May 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-10 - Published 5-19-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on May 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-10 - Published 5-19-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 341.14 (6r) (c) and 341.14 (6r) (fm) 7.; and to create 20.395 (5) (eq), 85.109, 341.14 (6r) (b) 14. and 341.14 (6r) (f) 61. of the statutes; relating to: special distinguishing registration plates associated with the Lions Clubs of Wisconsin and making an appropriation.
Title
Special distinguishing registration plates associated with the Lions Clubs of Wisconsin and making an appropriation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-10 | Published 5-19-2010 | |
2010-05-06 | Report approved by the Governor on 5-5-2010. 2009 Wisconsin Act 224 | |
2010-05-04 | Presented to the Governor on 5-4-2010 | |
2010-04-26 | Report correctly enrolled on 4-26-2010 | |
2010-04-21 | Received from Assembly concurred in | |
2010-04-20 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-04-20 | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 97, Noes 1 | |
2010-04-20 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-20 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-04-20 | Read a second time | |
2010-04-20 | Rules suspended and taken up | |
2010-04-20 | Read | |
2010-04-20 | Received from Senate | |
2010-04-20 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-04-20 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 33, Noes 0 | |
2010-04-20 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-20 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-04-20 | Senate substitute amendment 1 adopted | |
2010-04-20 | Senate amendment 1 to Senate substitute amendment 1 adopted | |
2010-04-20 | Read a second time | |
2010-04-19 | Placed on calendar 4-20-2010 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | |
2010-04-09 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-04-09 | Report passage as amended recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0 | |
2010-04-09 | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0 | |
2010-04-09 | Report introduction of Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0 by joint committee on Finance | |
2010-04-09 | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0 | |
2010-04-07 | Executive action taken | |
2010-01-19 | Referred to joint committee on Finance by committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e) | |
2010-01-14 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-01-14 | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Transportation, Tourism, Forestry, and Natural Resources, Ayes 6, Noes 1 | |
2010-01-14 | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by committee on Transportation, Tourism, Forestry, and Natural Resources, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | |
2010-01-14 | Executive action taken | |
2010-01-14 | Senate substitute amendment 1 offered by Senator Lazich | |
2009-10-15 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-10-15 | Public hearing held | |
2009-09-24 | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation, Tourism, Forestry, and Natural Resources | |
2009-09-24 | Introduced |