WI SB299 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - Published 4-17-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - Published 4-17-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 70.62 (4) of the statutes; Relating to: an exemption from the county property tax levy for municipalities on Madeline Island and Washington Island that levy taxes for airports or for public health or economic development services. (FE)
Title
An exemption from the county property tax levy for municipalities on Madeline Island and Washington Island that levy taxes for airports or for public health or economic development services. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Jauch [D] | Sen. Janet Bewley [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Senate | Published 4-17-2014 |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-16-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 282 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-15-2014 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2014-03-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-20 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2014-03-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-03-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-20 | House | Read a second time |
2014-03-20 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Rules and take up |
2014-03-18 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2014-03-12 | House | Received from Senate |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 33, Noes 0 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate Amendment 3 adopted |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 adopted |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-11-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate Amendment 3 offered by Senators Jauch and Lasee |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Workforce Development, Forestry, Mining, and Revenue, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Workforce Development, Forestry, Mining, and Revenue, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Workforce Development, Forestry, Mining, and Revenue, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2013-11-13 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Jauch |
2013-11-07 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jauch |
2013-10-03 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-09-13 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Workforce Development, Forestry, Mining, and Revenue |
2013-09-13 | Senate | Introduced |