WI SB28 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 43-9)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 43-9)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 40.05 (2) (ar); to amend 40.02 (27), 40.02 (48) (b) 3., 40.02 (48) (c), 40.05 (1) (b) 1., 40.23 (3) (a), 40.28 (1) (a) 2. and 40.73 (1) (am) 3.; and to create 40.02 (17) (n), 40.02 (48) (am) 23., 40.02 (48) (b) 5., 40.05 (1) (a) 7., 40.05 (1) (b) 1a., 40.05 (2) (ap), 40.05 (2) (ar) 2., 40.23 (3) (c), 40.65 (4w), 59.52 (8m) and 111.70 (4) (bn) of the statutes; Relating to: classifying county jailers as protective occupation participants under the Wisconsin Retirement System and the treatment of county jailers under the Municipal Employment Relations Act. (FE)
Title
Classifying county jailers as protective occupation participants under the Wisconsin Retirement System and the treatment of county jailers under the Municipal Employment Relations Act. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Senator Wirch added as a coauthor |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Marklein |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Representatives Andraca and Pronschinske added as cosponsors |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senator Quinn added as a coauthor |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Introduced |