WI AJR66 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Enrolled on January 17 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-09 - Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 27
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 17 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-09 - Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 27
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: the life and service of former Lawrence University president Richard Warch.
Title
The life and service of former Lawrence University president Richard Warch.
Sponsors
Rep. Penny Schaber [D] | Rep. Jon Richards [D] | Rep. Terese Berceau [D] | Sen. Janet Bewley [D] |
Rep. Garey Bies [R] | Rep. Andrew Jorgensen [D] | Rep. Robb Kahl [D] | Rep. Dean Kaufert [R] |
Rep. David Murphy [R] | Rep. John Murtha [R] | Rep. Tod Ohnstad [D] | Rep. Alvin Ott [R] |
Rep. Mandy Wright [D] | Sen. Michael Ellis [R] | Sen. Timothy Cullen [D] | Sen. Julie Lassa [D] |
Sen. John Lehman [D] | Sen. Mark Miller [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-09 | House | Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 27 |
2014-06-09 | House | Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 6-6-2014 |
2014-01-17 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 1-17-2014 |
2014-01-14 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Concurred in |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-14-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2013-11-21 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2013-11-21 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2013-11-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2013-11-14 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-11-14 | House | Adopted |
2013-11-12 | House | Placed on calendar 11-14-2013 by Committee on Rules |
2013-10-22 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-10-22 | House | Introduced |