WI AJR114 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: honoring the success of Ben Chan on Jeopardy!
Title
Honoring the success of Ben Chan on Jeopardy!
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2024-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-02-20 | House | Adopted |
2024-02-20 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2024-02-15 | House | Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 by Committee on Rules |
2024-02-12 | House | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor |
2024-02-07 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2024-02-07 | House | Introduced |