WI AJR112 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-3)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-3)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: the life and public service of Mary Lou (Rogers) Munts.
Title
The life and public service of Mary Lou (Rogers) Munts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2014-03-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-20 | House | Representative Wright added as a coauthor |
2014-03-20 | House | Adopted |
2014-03-18 | House | Placed on calendar 3-20-2014 by Committee on Rules |
2014-03-10 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-03-10 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/asm/joint_resolution/ajr112 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/AJR112.pdf |