WI AB910 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Published 3-22-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Published 3-22-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 139.75 (1); to amend 139.76 (1); and to create 139.75 (1d), 139.75 (1p), 139.75 (5u), 139.75 (6c), 139.75 (6g), 139.75 (9w), 139.76 (1e), 139.775, 139.795 and 139.815 of the statutes; Relating to: remote sellers of cigars and pipe tobacco. (FE)
Title
Remote sellers of cigars and pipe tobacco. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | House | Published 3-22-2024 |
2024-03-21 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 3-21-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 150 |
2024-03-18 | House | Presented to the Governor on 3-18-2024 |
2024-03-15 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-15-2024 |
2024-03-15 | House | LRB correction (Assembly Substitute Amendment 1) |
2024-03-12 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 30, Noes 2 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Read a second time |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-12-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and rereferred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Universities and Revenue, Ayes 7, Noes 1 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Universities and Revenue |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2024-02-13 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-02-13 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2024-02-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-02-13 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-13 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2024-02-13 | House | Read a second time |
2024-02-08 | House | Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 by Committee on Rules |
2024-02-07 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2024-02-07 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Jobs, Economy and Small Business Development, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2024-02-07 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Jobs, Economy and Small Business Development, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2024-02-06 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Swearingen |
2024-01-24 | House | Public hearing held |
2024-01-17 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-01-04 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Jobs, Economy and Small Business Development |
2024-01-04 | House | Introduced |