WI AB828 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Published 4-24-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Published 4-24-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 349.13 (1m); to renumber and amend 346.503 (2m); to amend 346.503 (3) and 346.503 (4); and to create 346.503 (1m) (am), 346.503 (2m) (b) and 349.13 (1m) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: parking spaces reserved for persons with physical disabilities. (FE)
Title
Parking spaces reserved for persons with physical disabilities. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | House | Published 4-24-2014 |
2014-04-23 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-23-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 327 |
2014-04-22 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-22-2014 |
2014-04-04 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 4-4-2014 |
2014-04-02 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Placed on calendar 4-1-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2014-03-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-18 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2014-03-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-03-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 adopted |
2014-03-18 | House | Read a second time |
2014-03-18 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Rules and take up |
2014-03-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-03-18 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2014-03-18 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2014-03-11 | House | Executive action taken |
2014-03-10 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Ripp |
2014-03-04 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Ripp |
2014-03-04 | House | Public hearing held |
2014-02-27 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-02-27 | House | Introduced |