WI AB726 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-3)
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Published 4-17-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-3)
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Published 4-17-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 961.14 (4) (t); and to create 961.38 (1n) of the statutes; Relating to: providing that cannabidiol is not a tetrahydrocannabinol and dispensing cannabidiol as a treatment for a seizure disorder.
Title
Providing that cannabidiol is not a tetrahydrocannabinol and dispensing cannabidiol as a treatment for a seizure disorder.
Sponsors
Rep. Robb Kahl [D] | Rep. Scott Krug [R] | Rep. Debra Kolste [D] | Sen. David Craig [R] |
Rep. Dana Wachs [D] | Rep. Christine Sinicki [D] | Sen. Janet Bewley [D] | Rep. Gordon Hintz [D] |
Rep. Josh Zepnick [D] | Rep. Terese Berceau [D] | Sen. Janis Ringhand [D] | Rep. Gary Hebl [D] |
Rep. Sondy Pope [D] | Rep. Jocasta Zamarripa [D] | Rep. Evan Goyke [D] | Rep. Tod Ohnstad [D] |
Sen. Melissa Agard [D] | Rep. Daniel Riemer [D] | Rep. Chris Taylor [D] | Rep. Garey Bies [R] |
Sen. Robert Wirch [D] | Sen. John Lehman [D] | Sen. Mark Miller [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-16 | House | Published 4-17-2014 |
2014-04-16 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-16-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 267 |
2014-04-15 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-15-2014 |
2014-04-07 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 4-7-2014 |
2014-04-07 | House | LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 1) |
2014-04-02 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 33, Noes 0 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senator Hansen added as a cosponsor |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senator Jauch added as a cosponsor |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senator L. Taylor added as a cosponsor |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senator Ellis added as a cosponsor |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a cosponsor |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senator Vinehout added as a cosponsor |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Placed on calendar 4-1-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Health and Human Services and rereferred to committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Senator Grothman added as a cosponsor |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Health and Human Services |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2014-03-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-18 | House | Representatives Shankland, Barca and Hulsey added as coauthors |
2014-03-18 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2014-03-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-03-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2014-03-18 | House | Read a second time |
2014-03-18 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar of 3-18-2014 and take up |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on calendar 3-18-2014 by Committee on Rules |
2014-03-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-03-07 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Children and Families, Ayes 7, Noes 1 |
2014-03-07 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Children and Families, Ayes 6, Noes 2 |
2014-02-26 | House | Executive action taken |
2014-02-24 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kahl |
2014-02-17 | House | Representative Kooyenga added as a coauthor |
2014-02-13 | House | Representatives Johnson, Pridemore and Czaja added as coauthors |
2014-02-12 | House | Public hearing held |
2014-02-12 | House | Representative Murphy added as a coauthor |
2014-02-05 | House | Representatives Thiesfeldt and Klenke added as coauthors |
2014-02-04 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Children and Families |
2014-02-04 | House | Introduced |