WI AB627 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 283.84 (1m) (c), 283.84 (2) and (3) and 283.84 (5); to amend 20.370 (4) (ag), 20.370 (4) (as), 283.84 (1), 283.84 (1m) (intro.), (a) and (b), 283.84 (3m) and 283.84 (4); and to create 283.84 (1) (d), 283.84 (1) (e), 283.84 (1m) (d), 283.84 (3r) and 283.84 (6) of the statutes; relating to: trading of water pollution credits, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Trading of water pollution credits, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2012-03-09 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2012-03-09 | House | Report passage recommended by committee on Natural Resources, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2012-03-07 | House | Executive action taken |
2012-03-07 | House | Public hearing held |
2012-03-06 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2012-02-24 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Natural Resources |
2012-02-24 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab627 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/AB627.pdf |