WI AB356 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-23 - Published 10-24-2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-23 - Published 10-24-2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 20.395 (2) (fs); to amend 20.395 (2) (ft) and 86.31 (3g); to create 20.395 (2) (fs) of the statutes; and to affect 2013 Wisconsin Act 20, section 9145 (7L) (b) (intro.) and 2013 Wisconsin Act 20, section 9145 (7L) (c); Relating to: a grant for the relocation of a county trunk highway in Manitowoc and Sheboygan counties and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
A grant for the relocation of a county trunk highway in Manitowoc and Sheboygan counties and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-10-15 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-08 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 79 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-08 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 79 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-23 | House | Published 10-24-2013 |
2013-10-23 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 10-23-2013. 2013 Wisconsin Act 49 |
2013-10-22 | House | Presented to the Governor on 10-22-2013 |
2013-10-22 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 10-22-2013 |
2013-10-16 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 33, Noes 0 |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Read a second time |
2013-10-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-15-2013 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2013-10-14 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2013-10-09 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2013-10-09 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2013-10-09 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2013-10-08 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-10-08 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 79, Noes 17 |
2013-10-08 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-10-08 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-10-08 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2013-10-08 | House | Read a second time |
2013-10-03 | House | Placed on calendar 10-8-2013 by Committee on Rules |
2013-10-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-10-03 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 9, Noes 2 |
2013-10-03 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 9, Noes 2 |
2013-10-01 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-09-24 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-09-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-09-18 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 14, Noes 2 |
2013-09-18 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 14, Noes 2 |
2013-09-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Joint Committee on Finance |
2013-09-18 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-09-13 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-09-12 | House | Representative Tittl added as a coauthor |
2013-09-11 | House | Read first time and referred to Joint Committee on Finance |
2013-09-11 | House | Introduced |