WI AB276 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 71.10 (4) (i); and to create 20.835 (2) (er) and 71.07 (8w) of the statutes; Relating to: refundable income tax credit for bicycle purchases and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Refundable income tax credit for bicycle purchases and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-06-14 | House | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor |
2023-05-30 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-05-19 | House | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor |
2023-05-17 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2023-05-17 | House | Introduced |