WI AB230 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-9)
Status: Passed on March 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-19 - Published 3-29-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-9)
Status: Passed on March 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-19 - Published 3-29-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 343.237 (2); to repeal and recreate 343.237 (2); and to create 165.8287 of the statutes; relating to: electronic access by law enforcement agencies to photographs on motor vehicle operators licenses and identification cards.
Title
Electronic access by law enforcement agencies to photographs on motor vehicle operators licenses and identification cards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-19 | Published 3-29-2010 | |
2010-03-16 | Report approved by the Governor on 3-15-2010. 2009 Wisconsin Act 167 | |
2010-03-11 | Presented to the Governor on 3-11-2010 | |
2010-03-05 | Report correctly enrolled | |
2010-03-02 | Received from Senate concurred in | |
2010-03-02 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-03-02 | Senator Lassa added as a cosponsor | |
2010-03-02 | Read a third time and concurred in | |
2010-03-02 | Rules suspended | |
2010-03-02 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-03-02 | Read a second time | |
2010-02-25 | Placed on calendar 3-2-2010 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | |
2010-01-20 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-01-20 | Report concurrence recommended by committee on Transportation, Tourism, Forestry, and Natural Resources, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | |
2010-01-20 | Executive action taken | |
2010-01-14 | Public hearing held | |
2009-11-09 | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation, Tourism, Forestry, and Natural Resources | |
2009-11-04 | Received from Assembly | |
2009-11-03 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2009-11-03 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 91, Noes 2 | |
2009-11-03 | Rules suspended | |
2009-11-03 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2009-11-03 | Assembly amendment 1 adopted | |
2009-11-03 | Read a second time | |
2009-10-29 | Placed on calendar 11-3-2009 by committee on Rules | |
2009-09-16 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2009-09-16 | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Transportation, Ayes 11, Noes 0 | |
2009-09-16 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Transportation, Ayes 11, Noes 0 | |
2009-09-10 | Assembly amendment 1 offered by committee on Transportation | |
2009-09-10 | Executive action taken | |
2009-07-20 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-07-16 | Public hearing held | |
2009-05-26 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-04-23 | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation | |
2009-04-23 | Introduced |