WI AB130 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 350.12 (4) (bg) 3. of the statutes; Relating to: modifying administrative rules related to supplemental aid for snowmobile trail maintenance and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Modifying administrative rules related to supplemental aid for snowmobile trail maintenance and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-01-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2024-01-23 | House | Made a special order of business at 10:04 AM on 1-25-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 23 |
2024-01-10 | House | Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor |
2023-10-19 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2023-10-19 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Forestry, Parks and Outdoor Recreation, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2023-06-06 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-05-12 | House | Representative Joers added as a coauthor |
2023-05-02 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-04-26 | House | Representative Pronschinske added as a coauthor |
2023-04-25 | House | Senator Spreitzer added as a cosponsor |
2023-04-25 | House | Representative C. Anderson added as a coauthor |
2023-04-18 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-03-31 | House | Representative Kitchens added as a coauthor |
2023-03-29 | House | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor |
2023-03-27 | House | Representative Dallman added as a coauthor |
2023-03-24 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Forestry, Parks and Outdoor Recreation |
2023-03-24 | House | Introduced |