WI AB1099 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-29 - Published 3-30-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-29 - Published 3-30-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 422.402 and 422.421 (8); to renumber and amend 140.17; to amend 140.02 (1) (e), 140.02 (2) (a), 140.02 (3), 140.02 (4) (b), 140.02 (6) (a), 428.202 (2) (d) 1. and 551.406 (3) (a) 2.; and to create 140.17 (2m) and (3) of the statutes; Relating to: updating an obsolete reference to the National Association of Securities Dealers, Inc.; eliminating an obsolete provision in the Wisconsin Consumer Act; updating a cross-reference to a federal law definition of high-cost mortgage; information included on a notary public's stamp and clarifying terminology and removing statutory duplication relating to notaries public (suggested as remedial legislation by the Department of Financial Institutions).
Title
Updating an obsolete reference to the National Association of Securities Dealers, Inc.; eliminating an obsolete provision in the Wisconsin Consumer Act; updating a cross-reference to a federal law definition of high-cost mortgage; information included on a notary public's stamp and clarifying terminology and removing statutory duplication relating to notaries public (suggested as remedial legislation by the Department of Financial Institutions).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-29 | House | Published 3-30-2024 |
2024-03-29 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 3-29-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 258 |
2024-03-26 | House | Presented to the Governor on 3-26-2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-13-2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Read a second time |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-12-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2024-02-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-02-22 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2024-02-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-02-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-22 | House | Read a second time |
2024-02-20 | House | Made a special order of business at 11:13 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28 |
2024-02-20 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Rules |
2024-02-20 | House | Introduced |