WA SB5285 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adding a new caseload for the official caseload forecast for the number of people eligible for the working families' tax credit under RCW 82.08.0206.
Title
Adding a new caseload for the official caseload forecast for the number of people eligible for the working families' tax credit under RCW 82.08.0206.
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Andrew Billig [D] | Sen. Annette Cleveland [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] |
Sen. Noel Frame [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] | Sen. T'wina Nobles [D] |
Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2023-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1218 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-04 - Effective date 7/23/2023.