WA HB2519 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Effective date 6/12/2014*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Effective date 6/12/2014*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning early education for children involved in the child welfare system.
Title
Concerning early education for children involved in the child welfare system.
Sponsors
Rep. Tana Senn [D] | Sen. Maureen Walsh [R] | Rep. Ruth Kagi [D] | Rep. Ross Hunter [D] |
Rep. Mary Roberts [D] | Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] | Rep. Kathryn Haigh [D] | Rep. Roger Goodman [D] |
Rep. Roger Freeman [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage on Reconsideration (Y: 81 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 86 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 86 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | House | Effective date 6/12/2014*. |
2014-03-31 | House | Chapter 160, 2014 Laws. |
2014-03-31 | House | Governor signed. |
2014-03-13 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-11 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 81; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-03-11 | House | Vote on third reading will be reconsidered. |
2014-03-11 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 86; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-03-11 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 2; absent, 1; excused, 0. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2014-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 90; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-13 | House | Floor amendment |
2014-02-13 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-11 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-10 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-10 | House | APP - Majority; do pass ELHS 14 bill proposed by Early Learning & Human Services. |
2014-02-10 | House | APP - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-10 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2014-02-03 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-03 | House | ELHS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-03 | House | ELHS - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-20 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services |