WA HB2378 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning practice settings for certified chemical dependency professionals and trainees.
Title
Concerning practice settings for certified chemical dependency professionals and trainees.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Harris [R] | Rep. Jay Rodne [R] | Rep. Tami Green [D] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] |
Rep. Dawn Morrell [D] | Rep. Mary Roberts [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-14 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 89 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |
2014-02-14 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 89; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2014-02-14 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-14 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2014-02-11 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-07 | House | APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-07 | House | APP - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2014-01-28 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2014-01-28 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2014-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |
Same As/Similar To
SB6140 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-20 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM.