WA HB2111 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the enforcement of regional transit authority fares.
Title
Concerning the enforcement of regional transit authority fares.
Sponsors
Rep. Jessyn Farrell [D] | Rep. Dave Hayes [R] | Rep. Jake Fey [D] | Rep. Jay Rodne [R] |
Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] | Rep. Dawn Morrell [D] | Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] |
Rep. Luis Moscoso [D] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Roger Freeman [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-10 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | House | Effective date 6/12/2014. |
2014-03-31 | House | Chapter 153, 2014 Laws. |
2014-03-31 | House | Governor signed. |
2014-03-13 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-10 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 95; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-03-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 38; nays, 11; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2014-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-13 | House | Floor amendment |
2014-02-13 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-07 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-04 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-01-30 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2014-01-30 | House | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-01-30 | House | TR - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2014-01-29 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2014-01-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2014-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |
2014-12-06 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5961 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-22 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.